Accounts and annual returns SOCIAL ARTS FOR EDUCATION

Charity number: 1150485
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 November 2019 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 November 2019 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window