Financial history SOCIAL ARTS FOR EDUCATION

Charity number: 1150485
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £71.31k £106.65k £134.40k £178.36k £405.88k
Total expenditure £76.71k £95.49k £134.91k £188.22k £301.13k
Income from government contracts £1.57k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.57k £35.79k £32.80k £49.86k £281.43k