Fairfield Independent Hospital

Charity number: 502791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 December 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 December 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time Download