Fairfield Independent Hospital

Charity number: 502791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.82m £13.43m £12.76m £13.97m £9.89m
Total expenditure £12.38m £13.11m £12.94m £13.93m £10.80m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £9.16m £10.17m N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.20k £2.25k £7.05k £1.15k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £12.77m £13.40m £12.71m £13.95m £9.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.10k £785 £106 £325 £0
Income - Other £43.59k £31.38k £40.31k £11.29k £64.39k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.38m £13.11m £12.94m £13.93m £10.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0