Fairfield Independent Hospital

Charity number: 502791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs C Dodwell Trustee 04 July 2011
KENDAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
WINDERMERE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Dr C Ince Trustee
ROTARY SHOEBOX SCHEME Received: On time
RAINHILL CIVIC SOCIETY Received: On time
Nathaniel Smillie Trustee 19 July 2019 None on record
Mr G Hammond Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
Mr C Bridge Trustee 29 July 2015 None on record
Mr C Barratt Chair 26 September 2012 None on record
Mrs S Watson Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Mr L Marlow Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Michael Patrick Rory Andrew Manning Trustee 16 September 2021 None on record