EPILEPSY SUCKS UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting safety
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 2012: Standard registration
- 18 August 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ESUK (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.33k | £12.56k | £17.89k | £11.92k | £13.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.97k | £22.33k | £20.08k | £13.04k | £13.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) SUPPORTING AND ADVISING PEOPLE WITH EPILEPSY, THEIR CARERS OR PARENTS OF PEOPLE WITH EPILEPSY BY SHARING PAST EXPERIENCES. B) POSITIVELY PROMOTING EPILEPSY AWARENESS. C) PROVIDING APPROVED ANTI-SUFFOCATION PILLOWS FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH EPILEPSY IN THE UK.”
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window