UNITED COUNTIES AGRICULTURAL AND HUNTERS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote improvements in agriculutre generally, inlcuding forestry and horticulture, by holding exhibitions thereof and to use the Charity's showground and land for the generation of income in support of such activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 04 December 1973: Standard registration
- UNITED COUNTIES AGRICULTURAL + HUNTERS SOCIETY (Working name)
- UNITED COUNTIES AGRICULTRUAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Myfanwy Sian Thomas | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
jane Morgan | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JEREMY EVANS | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lewis Evans | Trustee | 10 October 1988 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNN SCURLOCK DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.86k | £82.56k | £211.39k | £217.11k | £150.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.56k | £78.60k | £105.30k | £174.96k | £155.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £72.00k | £28.06k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.61k | £40.35k | £10.53k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1945 AS AMENDED 20/05/2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE IMPROVEMENT IN THE BREADS OF CATTLE, HORSES, SHEEP AND PIGS AND FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENTS AND ALL OTHER MATTERS CONNECTED AND APPERTAINING TO AGRICULTURE AND TO HOLD EXHIBITIONS AND OFFER PRIZES ACCORDINGLY. ALSO FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, FORESTRY, POULTRY KEEPING, DOGS, ARTS AND CRAFTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNITED COUNTIES AGRICULTURAL &
HUNTERS SOCIETY
THE SHOWGROUND
LLYSONNEN ROAD
CARMARTHEN
DYFED
- Phone:
- 01267232141
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window