DUMI INTERNATIONAL AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further such charitable purposes for the benefit of people in Sub-Saharan Africa (particularly in Zimbabwe) and in the England (particularly in Coventry and the county of Warwickshire) as the trustees see fit in particular but not limited to: advancing education; promoting good health and the saving of lives, relieving poverty. Health, Education, Clean water provision & humanitarian
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
- Botswana
- Lesotho
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 25 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DINA OKETCH | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Desson-Baxter | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
YESHPREET SINGH | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILES MORTON | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DUMISANI MOYO | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL CONYERS BENNETT BSC MPHIL | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.77k | £23.37k | £14.58k | £6.41k | £6.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.83k | £14.32k | £17.26k | £15.82k | £7.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA (PARTICULARLY IN ZIMBABWE) AND IN THE ENGLAND (PARTICULARLY IN COVENTRY AND THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: •RELIEVING POVERTY; •RELIEVING THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; •ADVANCING EDUCATION; •PROMOTING GOOD HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES; •ADVANCING IN LIFE, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED (A) TO PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; •PROMOTING CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP; •PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING TO ACHIEVE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (FALLING WITHIN THE DESCRIPTIONS OF PURPOSES SET OUT IN PART 1 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011); •PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; AND •PROMOTING RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 DUNHILL AVENUE
COVENTRY
CV4 9PX
- Phone:
- 02477986899
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window