Financial history THE GOLDCREST CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1147149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £136.35k £182.39k £154.17k £134.50k £98.32k
Total expenditure £132.96k £181.51k £177.18k £178.13k £85.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A