BRITISH SOCIETY OF GASTROENTEROLOGY

Charity number: 1149074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.23m £2.91m £3.64m £2.93m £3.14m
Total expenditure £4.17m £3.08m £3.40m £3.00m £3.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £422.25k £401.90k £390.82k £391.98k £395.23k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £46.37k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.61m £2.33m £3.05m £2.33m £2.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £139.86k £150.14k £172.19k £160.70k £188.67k
Income - Other £54.38k £27.86k £21.81k £0 £47.35k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.06m £3.00m £3.31m £2.91m £3.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £77.67k £84.45k £89.74k £143.70k
Expenditure - Governance £41.63k £31.74k £35.11k £0 £40.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.48k £145.38k £0 £0 £10.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £25.07k £24.79k £24.59k £25.04k £26.30k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0