Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY OF GASTROENTEROLOGY
Charity number: 1149074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Veitch | Chair | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Umesh Basavaraju | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Coral Hollywood | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Steed | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gerard McCauley | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Allan John Morris | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Colin Rees | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dhiraj Tripathi | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Jones | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Beverly Oates | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marina Azdejkovic | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Budd | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Lloyd | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Flitcroft | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.