Trustees FOUNDATION FOR ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1148274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LESLEY ANN JONES Chair 24 July 2012
None on record
Sanskriti Ravi Menon Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Joaquin Arturo Diaz Rios Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Petra Lambhera Maria Schut Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Sasha Karajovic Trustee 13 September 2018
None on record
NIKOS PETROU Trustee 16 September 2016
None on record
IAN CLIVE HUMPHREYS Trustee 16 September 2016
None on record
Laura Hickey Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record