CAMBOURNE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cambourne Church is a worshipping community committed to serving the needs of its community and has been involved in community based projects and activities throughout its history. We are currently working in partnership with a wide range of organisations to meet local needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 15 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Forbes | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Adam Edward Pollard | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean Williams | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Fielden Butler | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Thornton | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Taylor | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Jonathan David Slater | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Jonathan Miller | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ANDREW LEE | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £484.35k | £160.38k | £123.23k | £142.18k | £150.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £464.69k | £125.94k | £104.17k | £187.91k | £164.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.63k | £5.06k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAMBOURNE CHURCH OFFICE
The Blue School
Eastgate
Great Cambourne
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 6DZ
- Phone:
- 01954710644
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window