AL-HIKMA LEARNING SUPPORT TRUST (AHLST)

Charity number: 1149091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 27 June 2020 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 16 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 19 April 2017 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required