AL-HIKMA LEARNING SUPPORT TRUST (AHLST)

Charity number: 1149091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £4.45k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A