Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CHANDLERS RIDGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required