Accounts and annual returns SPARK INSIDE

Charity number: 1148420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window