Financial history SPARK INSIDE

Charity number: 1148420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £488.12k £624.03k £730.32k £939.83k £786.84k
Total expenditure £461.98k £476.44k £683.58k £790.97k £670.27k
Income from government contracts £56.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £70.80k N/A N/A £15.63k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £503.57k £494.90k £888.41k £769.99k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £230.54k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £117.46k £0 £45.45k £14.55k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.26k £4.16k £5.71k £2.28k
Income - Other N/A £730 £714 £252 £21
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £460.24k £662.73k £760.52k £641.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £16.20k £20.85k £30.46k £28.50k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.14k £0 £0 £13.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0