Trustees YOUTH UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUKHJINDER SINGH KALIRAI Chair 24 June 2021
None on record
Duncan Ian Callaghan Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Daniel Paul Richard Greaves Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Edward Martin Sherry OBE Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Alison Mary Oliver MBE Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Tafadzwa God'swish Gidi Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Andrew Christopher Lison Trustee 05 August 2020
None on record
Alexandra Peace-Gadsby Trustee 20 October 2016
RIDERS MINDS
Recently registered
FRIENDS OF NEWARK CASTLE AND VICTORIAN GARDENS
Recently registered
THE INSPIRE AND ACHIEVE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Paul Howard Stephen Trustee 19 November 2013
NEWHAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FASHION AND TEXTILE MUSEUM
Received: On time