Sandwell Aquatics Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Charity that provides the area of Sandwell with learn to swim programmes and offers competitive swimming and Triathlon coacheing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sandwell
Governance
- 06 June 2012: Standard registration
- OSTC (Working name)
- OLDBURY SWIMMING AND TRIATHLON CLUB (Previous name)
- Sandwell Aquatics Swimming Club (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa Elowa Akotshi | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Steele | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liz Wilkins | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Jones | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katina Fawke | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Hemmingway | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Drew-Cunniffe | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.62k | £166.30k | £51.54k | £126.09k | £229.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.44k | £158.62k | £61.01k | £120.41k | £196.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.48k | N/A | £6.10k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 1934 AS AMENDED ON 31/05/2012 as amended on 19 Jan 2022 as amended on 02 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF OLDBURY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SWIMMING AND THE OPPORTUNITY TO PARTICIPATE IN TRIATHLON EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Tudor Road
ROWLEY REGIS
B65 9LH
- Phone:
- 0121 559 7907
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window