7/7 TAVISTOCK SQUARE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1149388
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 18 January 2021 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 January 2020 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late