CHISEN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support children/young people with special needs and disabilities,their carers and other charitable organisations in Ghana. To relief poverty and deprivation by providing items, grants, disability equipment, and other services. Raising public awareness of the issues affecting disabled children and their carers in Ghana especially in relation to lack of resources, medicare and social exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Ghana
Governance
- 24 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA ADJOWA AKPOKAVIE | Chair | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH REDDIN | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY PATRICIA TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY SIKA AKPOKAVIE | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERRY LOPEZ | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAT WOOD | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERESA ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.41k | £10.63k | £8.89k | £6.95k | £9.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.63k | £7.21k | £9.54k | £8.20k | £10.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/01/2009 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR FAMILIES WHO HAVE CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES OR SPECIAL NEEDS IN GHANA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY,OR PARTS OF SOCIETY,AS A RESULT OF BEING DISABLED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY,FOR EXAMPLE BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,BY:•PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE PARENTS TO MAXIMISE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEIR DISABLED CHILDREN;•RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF ISSUES AFFECTING DISABLED CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS IN GHANA AND GREAT BRITAIN,BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION;•PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS DONATED FROM GREAT BRITAIN TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING DISABLED CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN ACCESSING HEALTHCARE•ESTABLISHING A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIESPROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTSOR THROUGH ANY OTHER SUCH LAWFUL ACTIVITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 DE HAVILLAND AVENUE
SHORTSTOWN
BEDFORD
MK42 0TQ
- Phone:
- 07594588729
- Email:
- chisenfoundation@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window