BOGNOR REGIS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1148187
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 March 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required