Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF DELIUS SPECIAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 23 June 2022 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2021 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required