Financial history FRIENDS OF DELIUS SPECIAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £6.80k £10.70k £16.11k £4.91k £2.29k
Total expenditure £2.87k £4.99k £20.58k £629 £111
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A