THE MISSION COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN'S KINGSTON BRIDGE

Charity number: 1148264
Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £445.15k £595.33k £507.71k £586.62k £620.16k
Total expenditure £54.25k £627.02k £443.01k £534.07k £594.31k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £560.71k £473.16k £558.73k £589.47k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £24.78k £10.25k £7.84k £8.81k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £9.83k £24.30k £20.06k £21.88k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £627.02k £443.01k £534.08k £594.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £1.86k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £59.59k £35.84k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0