ABBOTT FIVE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150477
Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £5.70k £5.00k £5.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.68k £4.50k £2.41k £1.41k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A