MERSEYSIDE SEA CADET TRAINING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To supply site and equipment to units of the Sea Cadets to enable them to carry out the required boating activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 09 July 2012: Standard registration
- LIVERPOOL DISTRICT SEA CADETS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Devaney | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Ian William Devaney | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Farrell | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Jarrett | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.16k | £2.16k | £1.21k | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £610 | £306 | £803 | £1.83k | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP SELF-CONFIDENCE, RESPECT FOR OTHERS, TEAM WORKING AND LEADERSHIP SKILLS TO HELP THEM ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS RESPONSIBLE ADULTS, BASED ON THE CUSTOMS AND TRADITIONS OF THE ROYAL NAVY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merseyside boating station
Knowsley Park
Prescot
Merseyside
L34 3AB
- Phone:
- 07752331917
- Email:
- i.devaney@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window