Financial history Sheffield Flourish

Charity number: 1147334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £104.48k £248.86k £160.97k £233.49k £317.70k
Total expenditure £117.83k £176.84k £176.00k £240.03k £292.35k
Income from government contracts £45.94k £65.85k £115.34k £127.08k £204.15k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £7.03k £31.06k