BELIEVERS' GENERATION OF BELIEVERS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £33.13k £40.05k £44.62k £49.65k £52.20k
Total expenditure £32.64k £39.20k £47.03k £49.94k £53.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A