LCGC

Charity number: 1148739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.60k £6.96k £11.43k £14.80k £19.32k
Total expenditure £1.60k £3.94k £8.42k £16.67k £20.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A