A LITTLE BIT OF HOPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a little bit of HOPE raises money in the UK to fund locally led, grass-roots, development projects in the Butaleja District of Uganda. We have four areas of programmes - Education; Health, water and sanitation; Business and innovation; and Vulnerable Households.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 June 2012: Standard registration
- 07 February 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 07 February 2019: Funds transferred to 1162178 A LITTLE BIT OF HOPE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.43k | £27.84k | £26.44k | £28.32k | £24.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.06k | £25.94k | £24.72k | £31.05k | £27.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 29 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 29 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 29 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 03 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 03 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN THE BUTALEJA DISTRICT OF UGANDA, THROUGH THE FUNDING OF SCHOOL BUILDING PROJECTS/EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES SPONSORSHIP OF CHILDREN PROVIDING TRAINING ENABLING FAMILIES TO SET-UP INCOME GENERATING PROJECTS SO THEY CAN AFFORD TO EDUCATE THEIR CHILDREN AND OTHER RELATIVES THE ESTABLISHMENT OF LINKS WITH SCHOOLS IN THE UK THE FUNDING OF APPROPRIATE MEDICAL NEEDS TO RAISE STANDARDS OF HEALTH 2)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG THE PEOPLE IN THE BUTALEJA DISTRICT OF UGANDA, THROUGH PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS, GROUPS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS THAT AIM TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FACILITATE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. PROVIDING TRAINING AND FUNDS TO INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS SETTING-UP OR RUNNING INCOME-GENERATING PROJECTS, SMALL BUSINESSES AND OTHER SELF-HELP ENTERPRISES PROVIDING FUNDING FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT, THE DEVELOPMENT OF MEDICAL FACILITIES AND HEALTH PROJECTS. PROVIDE ACCESS TO EXPERTISE AND FUNDS TO ENABLE COMMUNITIES TO EASILY ACCESS SAFE DRINKING WATER. 3)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE BUTALEJA DISTRICT, THROUGH THE SPONSORSHIP AND TRAINING OF LEADERS PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, INCLUDING BIBLES FUNDING OF CHURCH BUILDING PROJECTS SUPPORTING AND FUNDING OUTREACH INITIATIVES SUPPORTING AND FUNDING CHRISTIAN EDUCATION PROGRAMMES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window