PURBECK ISLE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1148703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 May 2020 28 April 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 24 May 2019 28 April 2021 400 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 24 May 2018 16 May 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 24 May 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 24 May 2016 12 May 2017 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2016 Not Required