ST JUDE'S PTA

Charity number: 1147566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 July 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 July 2019 16 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 July 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 July 2017 13 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 20 July 2016 24 July 2017 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2016 Not Required