THE HACKNEY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1149896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £155.00k £170.55k £257.00k £341.64k £1.38m
Total expenditure £131.00k £170.69k £230.00k £320.92k £667.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £0 £30.00k £22.50k £30.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £937.96k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £444.66k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £653.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.95k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0