THE WEST GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1147910
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 July 2019 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 01 July 2019 62 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 May 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 May 2018 30 days late
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 27 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 02 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 02 February 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)