Trustees ST BENEDICT'S SCHOOL EALING

Charity number: 1148512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL DAVIS Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Alex Avella Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
David Howe Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Alex Pereira-Inacio Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Melissa Davies-Wright Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Rosalind Nockles Trustee 02 October 2020
None on record
Mark Leonard Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Mary Edis Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
REV AMBROSE MCCAMBRIDGE OSB Trustee 09 March 2017
THE TRUST OF ST BENEDICT'S ABBEY EALING
Received: On time
Mary Boyle Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
Paul Keyte Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
Elizabeth Pilgrim Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
Jonathan Walsh Trustee 15 August 2012
ST JOHN'S SEMINARY CIO
Received: 66 days late
THE FOSTERING NETWORK
Received: On time
JONATHAN BERGER Trustee 15 August 2012
None on record
MICHAEL AINSLIE Trustee 15 August 2012
None on record
BRIAN ARTHUR EDWARD TAYLOR CB Trustee 15 June 2012
None on record
REVD DOMINIC TAYLOR Trustee 15 June 2012
None on record