SKI 2 FREEDOM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151307
Charity reporting is overdue by 153 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 August 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 August 2020 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 October 2019 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 01 July 2018 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 01 July 2018 366 days late Download