MISHON

Charity number: 1149271
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.18k £58.43k £38.49k £28.48k £27.92k
Total expenditure £25.90k £61.51k £43.71k £37.03k £31.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A