LONDON HIV CHAPLAINCY

Charity number: 1149729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 27 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 15 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 05 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 25 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 25 August 2017 On time Download