LONDON HIV CHAPLAINCY

Charity number: 1149729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £38.31k £56.38k £36.30k £32.55k £41.69k
Total expenditure £34.64k £38.15k £58.54k £37.27k £38.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A