LONDON HIV CHAPLAINCY

Charity number: 1149729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Louis Infield Trustee 04 September 2017
EVOLVE HOUSING + SUPPORT Received: On time
Pamela Christina Mhlophe Trustee 03 September 2018 None on record
Rev RICHARD STEPHEN JAMES PENROSE Trustee 07 August 2012 None on record
Rev BRUCE BATSTONE Trustee 07 September 2020
THE GREIG TRUST Received: On time
NORTH LONDON PASTORAL ASSISTANTS SCHEME Received: On time
HORNSEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL FOUNDATION) Received: On time
THE HORNSEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES Received: On time
Surraya Ayshea Richards Trustee 13 July 2021 None on record
Kanley McHalye Trustee 12 December 2016 None on record
Joshua Goddard Trustee 06 April 2020 None on record
Nicholas Sayer Trustee 03 September 2018 None on record
Rev Jongikaya Zihle Trustee 23 September 2021 None on record
Rev Ian John Worsfold Trustee 06 April 2020 None on record
Dr Paul Kybird Trustee 04 September 2017 None on record