COUNCIL FOR THE ETHNIC MINORITIES LUSOFONIA VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS (CEMLVO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the general public, in particular but not exclusively the socially and economically disadvantaged members of the wider Portuguese speaking communities and their third sector organisations by; a) the promotion of the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and the effective use of resources b) the provision of capacity building initiatives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 September 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Angola
- Australia
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Chile
- China
- Congo
- Cuba
- East Timor
- Equatorial Guinea
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Macau
- Malaysia
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- Portugal
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- South Africa
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 22 June 2012: Standard registration
- CEMLVO AND LUSOPHONE ALLIANCE (ALIANCA LUSOFONA) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PEDRO GAMMA | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
RAQUEL PAIVA | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/09/2017 | 07/09/2018 | 07/09/2019 | 07/09/2020 | 07/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £795 | £1.38k | £1.08k | £870 | £1.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120 | £295 | £164 | £89 | £393 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days | |
Annual return | 07 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days | |
Annual return | 07 September 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 September 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 September 2019 | 12 April 2021 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE WIDER PORTUGUESE SPEAKING COMMUNITIES (SOMETIMES CALLED PALOP OR LUSOFONIA OR LUSOPHONE), AND THE THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS THAT REPRESENTS THEM AND PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREAS OF ENGLAND AND WALES (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY 5(1) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVE OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE; 5(2) ASSISTING IN BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF THE THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. 5(3) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE LUSOFONIA (OR LUSOPHONIA) COMMUNITIES AND OTHER COMMUNITIES, PARTICULARLY NEWLY ARRIVED REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS, ESPECIALLY BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE SERVICES, AND ADVICE AND ADVOCACY REGARDING MATTERS SUCH AS IMMIGRATION, SOCIAL AND WELFARE RIGHTS, HEALTH, HOUSING, COMMUNITY INTEGRATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT; 5(4) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND ADVICE ON HEALTH ISSUES; 5(5) THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS: (A)"THIRD SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES. (B)"CHARITIES” ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (C)"VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
JEFF KAWENDE
Flat 41
Dacre House
Beaufort Street
LONDON
SW3 5BH
- Phone:
- 07508790570
- Email:
- director@cemlvo.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window