Financial history The L20 Hub

Charity number: 1147852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £180.95k £206.87k £207.86k £207.86k £227.92k
Total expenditure £191.44k £192.77k £192.99k £192.99k £247.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £72.16k £65.00k £73.33k N/A N/A