THE WILLOW GARDEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1148248
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 December 2016 On time Download