THE WILLOW GARDEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1148248
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £62.33k £45.06k £44.83k £41.13k £29.37k
Total expenditure £50.55k £42.35k £50.44k £46.52k £32.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.50k £615 £2.00k N/A