THE WILLOW GARDEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1148248
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Laird Trustee 09 January 2015 None on record
Allison Greer Trustee 09 January 2015 None on record
Victoria SCOTT Trustee 08 April 2016 None on record
PHILLIP MURPHY Trustee 18 January 2013 None on record
JACK CLARK Chair 18 July 2012 None on record
DERRIK VINCENT FOULKES Trustee 24 April 2013 None on record