HASTE ACADEMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education and promoting research in the field of heart related health,and in particular~:- (a) providing training to medical professionals;and (b) promoting public health in the identification,treatment and rehabilitation of persons suffering from abnormal heart performance or actual or potential coronary disease
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 October 2012: Standard registration
- 18 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.01k | £45.12k | £8 | £403 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.55k | £35.29k | £44.36k | £3.12k | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 09 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 31 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 27 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 26 April 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1.1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF HEART-RELATED HEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT, AND TO PROVIDE TRAINING TO MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS TO ENABLE THEM TO TREAT AND PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THE PUBLIC IN, THE PREVENTION OF, EARLY TREATMENT OF, RECOVERY FROM AND EARLY REHABILITATION FROM HEART ATTACKS AND STROKES; AND 3.1.2. TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE IDENTIFICATION, TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ABNORMAL HEART PERFORMANCE OR ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL CORONARY DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window