ZAKAT FOUNDATION OF INDIA (INTERNATIONAL)

Charity number: 1149542
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £6.59k £4.05k £2.47k £15.32k £17.27k
Total expenditure £6.51k £1.23k £500 £21.63k £2.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A