ST CLARES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147761
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 February 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 August 2016 On time Download